Dogfen lywodraethu YORK ALCOHOL ADVICE SERVICE
Rhif yr elusen: 700394
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 1988, 25 OCTOBER 1988, 10 NOVEMBER 1992, 8 MARCH 1993, 2 NOVEMBER 1993, 28 FEBRUARY 2000 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION OF ALCOHOL MISUSE AND THE TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING THEREFROM WITHIN THE AREA COVERED BY YORK HEALTH SERVICES TRUST.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE AREA COVERED BY YORK HEALTH SERVICES TRUST
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.