Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX (SALFORD)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 APRIL 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18TH DECEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAR 2016 as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF SALFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
THE CITY OF SALFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.