Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOUTH WALES MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ACTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 MAY 1989 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME 17 NOVEMBER 1993, AS AMENDED SPEC. RESOLUTION 25 JUNE 1995 AND 30 JUNE 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO AID AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AS DEFINED IN MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION OF THE COMPANY) THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS TO ASSIST ARMS (MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS RESEARCH) LTD IN PROMOTING (WHETHER OR NOT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) ALL OR ANY OF ITS OBJECTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3)
Maes buddion
EAST DYFED,WEST MID GLAM,& ELSEWHERE IN UK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.