Dogfen lywodraethu NORTON HOUSING AND SUPPORT LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 DEC 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 18 APR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUL 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SUPPORT AND AFTER-CARE FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS 3) THE PROVISION OF RECOVERY AND REHABILITATION SERVICES FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS 4) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS LIVING IN THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.