Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNITY VENTURES (MIDDLESBROUGH) LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/02/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/01/2001 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 FEB 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR ARE SUFFERING THE CONSEQUENCES OF UNEMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE. FOR MORE INFORMATION PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CHARITY'S GOVERNING DOCUMENT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.