Trosolwg o'r elusen JOHN CASLOCK (EXCLUDING EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)
Rhif yr elusen: 212165-2
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL 20 MAY 1651 AND SCHEMES OF 18 DECEMBER 1896 AND 15 DECEMBER 1961 AND DETERMINATION ORDER OF 30 MAY 1905 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 3 DECEMBER 1987
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) A YEARLY PAYMENT OF NOT MORE THAN ú82 10S. TO FAVERSHAM BOROUGH COUNCIL FOR THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF FAVERSHAM RECREATION GROUND. 2) BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE OF THE ALMHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITIES WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN FIVE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF FAVERSHAM
Hanes cofrestru
- 16 Chwefror 2011: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1140259 THE FAVERSHAM MUNICIPAL CHARITIES 2010
- 22 Ionawr 1963: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Chwefror 2011: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.