Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN SWINDON
Rhif yr elusen: 800056
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 1992, 2 JULY 1993, 6 JULY 1994, 14 APRIL 1997 AND 17 MARCH 1999
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND SWINDON.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
IN AND AROUND SWINDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.