Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 1988, 28 OCTOBER 1988, 10 JULY 2007 AND 23 JULY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS. 2. TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS FOR ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.