Dogfen lywodraethu LASA CHARITY UK LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 30 OCTOBER 1987, 24 NOVEMBER 1999 & 26 SEPTEMBER 2006 & BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY INDEPENDENT ADVICE FOR ALL AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND CO-ORDINATION OF LEGAL AND ADVICE SERVICES AND TO ENCOURAGE CO-OPERATION BETWEEN AGENCIES PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES; (B) TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST IN THE INTRODUCTION OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN CHARITABLE AGENCIES; (C) TO CARRY OUT, COMMISSION AND PUBLISH STUDIES AND RESEARCH INTO THE PROVISION OF LEGAL ADVICE AND VOLUNTARY SERVICES AND TO DEVELOP POLICY RESPONSES TO THIS RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.