Dogfen lywodraethu THE CAMBRIDGE CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC DATA CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 800579

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH AUGUST 1987 AS AMENDED ON 7 DECEMBER 1999 AND 28 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 MAY 2010 as amended on 05 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE SCIENCE OF CHEMISTRY AND CRYSTALLOGRAPHY IN ALL ITS BRANCHES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.