Dogfen lywodraethu THE MYALGIC ENCEPHALOPATHY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15TH JUNE 1991, 14TH JULY 2001 AND 3RD SEPTEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE A) TO OFFER RELIEF TO PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH MYALGIC ENCEPHALOPATHY (ME) / CHRONIC FATIGUE SYNDROME (CFS) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND B) TO FURTHER EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ILLNESS AND C) TO SUPPORT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.