Dogfen lywodraethu BOURNEMOUTH MALE VOICE CHOIR
Rhif yr elusen: 801320

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 18/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 14/02/1989, 11/08/1992, 14/05/2002, 23/05/2006 AND 01/05/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; (B) TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.