Dogfen lywodraethu THE AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE
Rhif yr elusen: 802887
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1989 AMENDED 15 MARCH 1990, 18 OCTOBER 1996, 10 MAY 2001 AND 15TH MARCH 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE COMMUNICATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND BY THE INSTRUCTION OF CHRISTIANS IN CHRISTIAN LIFE AND SERVICE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.