Dogfen lywodraethu MENINGITIS NOW
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENINGITIS (WHICH IN THESE OBJECTS MEANS MENINGITIS IN ALL FORMS AND INCLUDES ALL AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS) OR SEPTICAEMIA OR WHO ARE DISABLED AS A RESULT OF MENINGITIS OR SEPTICAEMIA. B. TO UNDERTAKE AND FUND RESEARCH INTO ALL STRAINS OF MENINGITIS WHETHER VIRAL OR BACTERIAL OR SEPTICAEMIA AND TO PUBLISH, ASSIST WITH, AND/OR FUND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF. C. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF MENINGITIS AS A SERIOUS MEDICAL PROBLEM. D. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO SUFFER MENINGITIS OR SEPTICAEMIA AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES, GUARDIANS OR PARTNERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.