Dogfen lywodraethu SANTANDER UK FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2014 as amended on 18 Jun 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, "NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS" AND COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE CONCERNED WITH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT PROVIDED THAT ANY SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE CONDITIONED UPON IT BE APPLIED SOLELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.