Dogfen lywodraethu THE BASINGSTOKE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 1989 AS AMENDED 23 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 5 MARCH 2010 as amended on 31 Aug 2023 as amended on 24 Aug 2023 as amended on 24 Aug 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Basingstoke and Deane and surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.