Dogfen lywodraethu SUMMERTOWN CHORAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 900317

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 14/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 07/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2016 as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE REHEARSAL OF CHORAL MUSIC, THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.