Dogfen lywodraethu LAMERTON HALL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME OF 6 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS 14 NOVEMBER 2002 AND 28 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 30 JAN 2007 as amended on 09 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PARISH HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. OR 1(B) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS WORK OF THE C OF E IN THE AOB BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PARISH HALL. 1(C) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
THE PARISH OF LAMERTON AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.