Dogfen lywodraethu UNIVERSITY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE TRUST INCORPORATING THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOUNDATION OF ST PAUL AND ST MARY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH JANUARY 1990, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION OF 20TH MARCH 1996, 21 MAY 1996 AND 31ST MARCH 2004, INSTRUMENT OF GOVERNMENT 28 JANUARY 1990 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT 28 FEBRUARY 1990.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION OF MEN AND WOMEN (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS) BY THE PROVISION CONDUCT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE COLLEGE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ARRANGEMENTS APPROVED BY THE SECRETARY OF STATE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.