Elusen gysylltiedig 232040-6 HERBERT FITCH BEQUEST
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL PROVED IN P.R. 3 JANUARY 1934 AND SCHEMES OF 29/10/1948, 22/3/1955, 5/7/1967 AND 14/1/1972
Gwrthrychau elusennol
BENEFIT OF MEN WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE PRINTING INDUSTRY OR ALLIED TRADES OR IN THE DISTRIBUTIVE TRADES THEROF WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru