Elusen gysylltiedig 1053793-40 ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST STAFF WELFARE
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN THE TRUST BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF OF THE SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru