Elusen gysylltiedig 1053793-29 ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CANCER CARE GENERAL FUND -
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
APPLY THE INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSE PRINCIPALLY IN CONNECTION WITH CANCER CARE WITHIN THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru