DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008 as amended on 28 Aug 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE CONTINUING CARE SERVICES PROVIDED BY ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST