Dogfen lywodraethu TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MARCH 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1997, 21 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 OCT 2018 as amended on 29 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND CULTURAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE DRAMA MUSIC OTHER PERFORMING ARTS AND THE ARTS GENERALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD. (B) TO MAINTAIN, DEVELOP AND MANAGE A THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY OTHER BODIES IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE CARRYING ON OF ALL SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECTS. (C) FOR SO LONG AS THE COMPANY SHALL OCCUPY THE BUILDING OF TRINITY THEATRE AND ARTS CENTRE CHURCH ROAD TUNBRIDGE WELLS FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE, TO MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE THE SAID BUILDING BOTH FOR THE IMMEDIATE PURPOSES OF THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY AND FOR THE LONG TERM BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD. (D) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A HERITAGE ATTRACTION AND PROVIDE OTHER EDUCATIONAL OR CULTURAL FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HERITAGE OF, AND THE HERITAGE OF ANY BUILDINGS IN, TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Maes buddion
TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.