SAFEWISE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Educate children and adults generally and in particular those children and adults residing in the County of Dorset and neighbouring counties of Wiltshire and Hampshire and to foster their awareness of safetly issues in everyday life including (but not limited to) safety in the house or work place, in education establishments, on the roads, or during any leisure activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £224,423 o 5 grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dorset
- Wiltshire
Llywodraethu
- STREETWISE (Enw gwaith)
- DORSET INTERACTIVE SAFETY EDUCATION CENTRE LIMITED (Enw blaenorol)
- STREETWISE PARTNERSHIP TRUST LIMITED (Enw blaenorol)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £754.66k | £482.80k | £543.02k | £597.71k | £475.93k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £773.06k | £512.83k | £572.82k | £609.58k | £508.05k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £182.00k | £142.50k | £206.80k | £255.94k | £224.42k | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £579.73k | N/A | £417.33k | £436.12k | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £174.89k | N/A | £125.64k | £161.49k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £41 | N/A | £52 | £98 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £620.21k | N/A | £414.80k | £513.90k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £152.85k | N/A | £158.02k | £89.68k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £4.49k | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | N/A | £0 | £6.00k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 91 diwrnod | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Overdue | Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen yn hwyr o 91 diwrnod | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | |||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | |||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1)TO EDUCATE CHILDREN AND ADULTS GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE CHILDREN AND ADULTS RESIDING IN DORSET, BOURNEMOUTH AND POOLE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES AND TO FOSTER THEIR AWARENESS OF SAFETY ISSUES IN EVERYDAY LIFE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) SAFETY IN THE HOUSE OR WORKPLACE, IN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, ON THE ROADS, OR DURING ANY LEISURE ACTIVITIES; 2)TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE PRIVATE, PUBLIC AND VOLUNTARY SECTORS OF THE COMMUNITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO (A) PROVIDE EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO SAFETY AND HEALTH ISSUES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FIRE PREVENTION AND THE PREVENTION, SOLUTION AND REDUCTION OF CRIME; AND (B) RELIEVE AND OR REDUCE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window