COLCHESTER YMCA
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The main areas of charitable activity are the provision of safe and affordable accommodation and support; social and personal development. The charity is also involved with outreach community work and youth work.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2015
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £211,434 o gontract(au) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Llety/tai
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Essex
Llywodraethu
- 07 Rhagfyr 2016: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1054070 YMCA ESSEX
- 06 Chwefror 1997: Cofrestrwyd
- 07 Rhagfyr 2016: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- COLCHESTER FOYER (Enw gwaith)
- COLCHESTER YMCA FOYER (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £408.59k | £395.47k | £384.36k | £394.48k | £394.05k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £388.39k | £387.13k | £356.50k | £389.45k | £394.79k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £211.43k | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 27 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Mawrth 2015
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
27 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 02 Rhagfyr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 02 Rhagfyr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 12 Tachwedd 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 12 Tachwedd 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 OCTOBER 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO UNITE THOSE WHO REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM (2) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (4) TO PROVIDE, IMPROVE AND MANAGE HOUSES AND HOSTELS PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN OF ALL AGES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS (5) TO ESTABLISH AND PROVIDE DIRECTLY OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF ALL KINDS INCLUDING VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, JOB APPLICATION SKILLS, GENERAL SOCIAL SKILLS AND THE LIKE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE COLCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window