Dogfen lywodraethu JOHN LAING CHARITABLE TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 21 DECEMBER 1962 AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1 OCTOBER 1963, 24 SEPTEMBER 1974, 30 APRIL 2004 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2023 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15 MAY 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED HOLD THE TRUST PROPERTY UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY INCAPACITY OR SICKNESS OR FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR RELIGION OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES GENERALLY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 3.2 WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING PROVISION OF THIS CLAUSE THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN EXERCISING THEIR DISCRETION AS TO THE APPLICATION OF THE TRUST PROPERTY CONTINUE TO HAVE SPECIAL REGARD TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF FORMER EMPLOYEES OF JOHN LAING OR THEIR DEPENDENTS BY THE PROVISION OF GRATUITIES, ALLOWANCES OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR SUCH FORMER EMPLOYEES OR THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE FORMER EMPLOYEES OR THEIR DEPENDENTS WHO ARE IN SPECIAL NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE ON ACCOUNT OF ANY ILLNESS OR ON ACCOUNT OF OLD AGE OR FROM OTHER CAUSES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.