YOUTH FOR CHRIST CALDERDALE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Organising Youth Outreach events. Co-ordinating and and publicising Christian Youth Group activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Calderdale
Llywodraethu
- 25 Mawrth 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 263446 BRITISH YOUTH FOR CHRIST
- 25 Mawrth 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1099716 HALIFAX CENTRAL CHURCH
- 25 Mawrth 2022: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1097660 Christians In Calderdale Schools
- 23 Tachwedd 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Mawrth 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- YFC CALDERDALE (Enw gwaith)
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £22.31k | £6.19k | £9.50k | £2.49k | £1.51k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £49.12k | £7.32k | £8.87k | £3.91k | £1.14k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 18 Mawrth 2022 | 261 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 09 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2018 | 07 Hydref 2019 | 99 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2018 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's objects ("the objects") are as follows: (a) To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of young people in accordance with the statement of faith appearing in appendix 1 throughout the world and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) in [???] and its environs; (b) the advancement of the Christian faith mainly, but not exclusively by means of proclaiming Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature throughout the world and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) in [???] and its environs; (c) to demonstrate, promote and encourage Christian values, including Dignity, Empowerment and Partnership to all young people throughout [???] and its environs; (d) the advancement of the education of children and young people through support and mentoring in schools, colleges and other educational establishments. Through lunchtime and after school clubs, street based youth work and other youth provision to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities, that they may grow to full maturity as individuals, and that their condition of life may be improved; (e) to relieve poverty and sickness thereby demonstrating the Christian faith by promoting overseas service, education, practical action and working with those affected, either directly or through relevant relief agencies.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window