FRIENDS OF HOLT HALL
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We run 3 'open gates' events days to raise money for the Bursary. We use the Bursary to enable less privileged young people to attend Holt Hall Residential Environmental and Outdoor Learning Centre, including day visits. We support vulnerable young people to access work experience opportunities at Holt Hall. We write bids to enable young people to develop employability skills (green economy).
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Norfolk
Llywodraethu
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1128752 Holt Youth Project
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 311119 WHITWELL HALL COUNTRY CENTRE LTD
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 303986 HORSTEAD CENTRE
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 289171 HOW HILL TRUST
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 208734 NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
- 11 Ebrill 2013: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Tachwedd 2023: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (GI))
Dim enwau eraill
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £1.99k | £2.72k | £759 | £8.64k | £25 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.14k | £2.95k | £570 | £2.15k | £12.35k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 11 Hydref 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 29 Tachwedd 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 05 Tachwedd 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 30 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1)TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN PARTICULAR THOSE USING HOLT HALL IN HOLT, NORFOLK BY: (A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING THEM DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B)ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION; (C)PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO VOLUNTEER TO FURTHER A CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES; AND (D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS IN ALL INSTANCES BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT INCLUDING PROVIDING THEM WITH ACCESS TO OUTDOOR FACILITIES THAT FOCUS ON BIODIVERSITY AND SUSTAINABILITY. (2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR USING HOLT HALL AS A EDUCATIONAL RESOURCE AND SUPPORTING PUBLIC ACCESS TO IT (IN SUCH WAYS THAT DO NOT RELIEVE THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OF ITS STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS). (3)TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT HOLT HALL AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT (PROVIDING IN DOING SO THE TRUSTEES DO NOT RELIEVE ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR GOVERNMENT OF THEIR STATUTORY RESPONSIBILITIES).
Maes buddion
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window