COMMONWEALTH PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The CPA advances health, promotes wellbeing and improves education for the benefit of the public. We support the development of safe and effective systems of medicines management, healthier lifestyles, and the reduction of health inequalities. We achieve this through supporting our member organisations to improve the use of medicines through access to education and collaborative networks.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 12 Gorffennaf 2019: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1176132 THE COMMONWEALTH PHARMACISTS ASSOCIATION
- 15 Rhagfyr 2015: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Gorffennaf 2019: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
- CPA (Enw gwaith)
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £49.78k | £54.62k | £66.01k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £51.26k | £73.76k | £87.61k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2018 | 30 Ebrill 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2018 | 30 Ebrill 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2017 | 30 Ebrill 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2017 | 30 Ebrill 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2016 | 27 Ebrill 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2016 | 27 Ebrill 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1970 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/2007 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/10/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY COLLABORATING WITH OTHER HEALTH-RELATED ORGANISATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE COMMONWEALTH AND PROVIDING ADMINISTRATIVE AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT WHERE POSSIBLE; 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST PHARMACEUTICAL STAFF) BY FACILITATING THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE ABOUT THE PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES AND THE PROFESSIONAL PRACTICE OF PHARMACY THROUGH MEETINGS, LITERATURE DISTRIBUTION, ELECTRONIC MEDIA AND FELLOWSHIP OR EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES; 3.3 TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH QUALITY IMPROVEMENT OF PHARMACY PRACTICE, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE PROMOTION OF SAFE AND EFFECTIVE SYSTEMS OF MEDICINES MANAGEMENT, THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHIER LIFESTYLES AND SUPPORTING MEASURES TO REDUCE HEALTH INEQUALITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window