THE BATON OF HOPE UK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Baton of Hope UK raises awareness of suicide prevention, improving access to information and services so as to prevent suicide. It acts as a national umbrella resource body to promote action, to improve understanding, services and responses; as a forum to bring about change and hope; and it is a catalyst for initiatives such as the work place charter, safe havens & mental health first aiders.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 11 Mai 2023: Cofrestrwyd
- BATON OF HOPE (Enw gwaith)
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
9 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael McCarthy | Cadeirydd | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Amelia Rush | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Wright | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Abbi Thomas | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Marwaha | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Geoff McDonald | Ymddiriedolwr | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juthika Bhayani | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Wilson Mr. | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Louise Craig | Ymddiriedolwr | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUL 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 MAY 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY LIAISING AND COLLABORATING WITH CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING IN SUICIDE PREVENTION IN ORDER TO: A) PROVIDE A FORUM TO IDENTIFY GAPS IN THE RANGE OF CHARITABLE SERVICES AVAILABLE TO THOSE THEY SERVE; B) PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO THOSE WORKING IN THIS FIELD; C) REPRESENTING THE VIEWS OF THE FORUM TO POLICY MAKERS AND FUNDERS; D) PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING, CHARITIES, INITIATIVES AND ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RAISE AWARENESS OF SUICIDE. 2.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE STRUGGLING FROM SUICIDAL IDEATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY FUNDING, SIGNPOSTING AND/OR IMPROVING ACCESS TO: A) SHORT-TERM ACCOMMODATION AT SAFE HAVENS AND ACCESS TO SUITABLY QUALIFIED COUNSELLORS AND / OR PRACTITIONERS; B) MENTAL HEALTH FIRST AIDERS IN SCHOOLS AND WORKPLACES, AND IN OTHER SITUATIONS WHERE A MEDICAL FIRST AIDER WOULD BE REQUIRED, SUCH AS AT MAJOR SPORTING EVENTS AND CONCERTS. 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS AND PREVENTION OF SUICIDE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) COLLECTING DATA, CONDUCTING, COMMISSIONING AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH; AND B) THE PROVISION, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING OF TRAINING, WORKSHOPS, MENTORING, CONFERENCES AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES; C) THE SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT OF INFORMATION AND AWARENESS RAISING DOCUMENTARIES WITH AN EDUCATIONAL FOCUS. 2.4 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS AT RISK OF SUICIDE AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE AT RISK OF SUICIDE AND INDICATORS FOR THE BEHAVIOUR OF SUCH PEOPLE AND HOW TO SUPPORT THEM; B) HIGHLIGHTING AND SIGNPOSTING TO SOURCES OF SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AT RISK; C) HIGHLIGHTING AND SIGNPOSTING THE NEED FOR, AND ACCESS TO, FAMILY LIAISON AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR FAMILIES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
THE BATON OF HOPE UK
THE CIRCLE
33 ROCKINGHAM LANE
SHEFFIELD
S1 4FW
- Ffôn:
- 07711042088
- E-bost:
- mike@batonofhopeuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.