WALLASEY VILLAGE LIBRARY & COMMUNITY CENTRE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity was established following a successful application to Wirral Borough Council to secure the future of the library via their 'Community Asset Transfer' process. The charity seeks to reopen the building, maintaining a library, freely available to residents, while also incorporating a dedicated community space and a cafe.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Wirral
Llywodraethu
- 02 Ionawr 2024: y derbyniwyd cronfeydd gan 213990 THE LONSDALE TRUST WALLASEY
- 22 Awst 2023: CIO registration
Dim enwau eraill
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
11 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephenie Walsh | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Jane Pugh | Ymddiriedolwr | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stephen Byrne | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Sarah Sturgess | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Alderton | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Duggan | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Simpson | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Bill Wyllie | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Jones | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Lyons | Ymddiriedolwr | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lewis | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 July 2023 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Aug 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WALLASEY, WIRRAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES, BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A COMMUNITY LENDING LIBRARY; (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF WALLASEY, WIRRAL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OR COMMUNITIES, THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR RECREATION AND/OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Wallasey Village Library
St George's Road
Wallasey
Wirral
CH45 3NE
- Ffôn:
- 01516386014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.