Dogfen lywodraethu BLACKBURNE HOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 DECEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1997 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 APRIL 2003 AND 25 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 SEP 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE NEED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND BY PROVIDING GUIDANCE FOR SUCH OF THEM AS ARE IN NEED, CALCULATED TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE PROVISION OF THE VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND GUIDANCE FOR WOMEN; (2) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES DIRECTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE NEEDS OF WOMEN.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.