Dogfen lywodraethu DOWNE HOUSE SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/08/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/06/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOREGOING TO CONDUCT ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANY PART OF THE WORLD ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES IN ALL DISCIPLINES AND FIELDS OF STUDY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.