Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL COLLECTION TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 APR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 NOV 2012 as amended on 10 Mar 2021 as amended on 10 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION (A) TO ADMINISTER, CONSERVE, RENOVATE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVISE ON THE ROYAL COLLECTION, THE ROYAL ARCHIVES AND THE ROYAL PHOTOGRAPHIC COLLECTION WHICH PASS IN RIGHT OF THE CROWN; AND (B) TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE PUBLIC ABOUT SUCH COLLECTIONS AND ARCHIVES BY EXHIBITION, BY PREPARATION OF CATALOGUES AND INVENTORIES, BY RESEARCH AND BY PUBLICATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS ARE APPROPRIATE; 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.