Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF BISHOPS CLEEVE PRIMARY ACADEMY
Rhif yr elusen: 1020941
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/1989 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.