Dogfen lywodraethu Neuro Therapy Network Limited

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/04/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2012 as amended on 25 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: A)TO PROVIDE A CENTRAL FACILITY FOR THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES TO MEMBER CENTRES, FOR LEADERSHIP AND REPRESENTATION ON ISSUES OF COMMON INTEREST AND FOR SPECIFIC ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUAL CENTRES: B)TO PROVIDE ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND MORAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT FOR PERSONS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS: C)TO PROVIDE THERAPY (INCLUDING HYPERBARIC OXYGEN THERAPY) FOR PERSONS WITH MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR OTHER SYMPTOMS OR CONDITIONS.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.