Dogfen lywodraethu THE RCJ AND ISLINGTON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/04/1998 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 AUG 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE HAVING BUSINESS AT THE ROYAL COURTS OF JUSTICE AND OTHERS LIVING OR WORKING THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, IN PARTICULAR IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ISLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.