Dogfen lywodraethu INVOLVE NORTHWEST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 JULY 2003, 19 FEBRUARY 2008 AND 4 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 APRIL 2008 as amended on 11 Dec 2024 as amended on 05 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To benefit the inhabitants of the United Kingdom, with particular emphasis on people resident in the Northwest of England, by the promotion of such charitable purpose(s) as the Charity’s trustees in their absolute discretion decide to: a. improve the quality of life for individuals, families and communities. b. educate, promote, sustain and increase individual and collective knowledge of measures that will improve the quality of life for individuals, families and communities.
Maes buddion
NORTHWEST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.