Dogfen lywodraethu RSCDS BRISTOL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 1996 AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 21 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2017 as amended on 16 Nov 2023 as amended on 16 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING, IN PARTICULAR BY: A. PRESERVING AND FURTHERING THE PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES. B. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING INSTRUCTION IN THE DANCING OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES C. PROMOTING THE ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND ITS MUSIC BY ANY SUITABLE MEANS D. GENERALLY DOING SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE OR MAY BE CONSIDERED BY THE LOCAL ASSOCIATION TO FURTHER THE FOREGOING OBJECTS AND THOSE OF THE SOCIETY IN THE DISTRICT OR AREA TO WHICH THE LOCAL ASSOCIATION RELATES ETC
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.