Dogfen lywodraethu ELIZABETH WRIGHT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF CHANCERY OF THE 5TH JUNE 1810. (R.V. 31 PAGE 288) DETERMINATION ORDER DATED THE 19TH MAY 1905 AND SCHEMES OF THE 31ST OCTOBER 1966 AND 29TH APRIL 1981 as amended on 11 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. YEARLY SUM OF $10 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME TO THE VICAR OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL WISBECH FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON ST PAUL'S DAY. 2. YEARLY SUM OF $10 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME TO THE SAID VICAR FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON ST BARNABAS' DAY. 3. SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WISBECH ST PETER. PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE WHO REGULARLY ATTEND THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST PETER WISBECH.
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF WISBECH ST PETER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.