Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH-GERMAN ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH MARCH 1958 AS AMENDED 10TH JUNE 1970, 29TH 0CTOBER 1986, 25TH APRIL 1995 AND 14TH NOVEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 MAY 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND IN THE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC, HISTORY, ECONOMICS, PHILOSOPHY, CULTURE OR OTHER RECOGNISED SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC STUDY OF GERMANY. (B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY IN THE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC, HISTORY, ECONOMICS, PHILOSOPHY, CULTURE OR OTHER RECOGNISED SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC STUDY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AT UNIVERSITIES, TECHNICAL SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND PROFESSIONAL INSTITUTES AND OTHER FOUNDATIONS THEREIN. (C) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT GERMANY AND ITS PEOPLES, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, INSTITUTIONS, CULTURE AND ITS ARTISTIC, INTELLECTUAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE AS AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.