Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIEND PUBLICATIONS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 20TH MAY 1958 as amended on 04 Mar 2019 as amended on 03 Jan 2020 as amended on 27 Sep 2019 as amended on 03 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
Advancing the religious teaching of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers): (1) through the production and publishing of independent Quaker publications in formats both printed and digital, that cover the life, work and witness of Quakers, and benefits the said Society although not official publications of the said Society, and (2) by providing accessible and affordable publications and information to the Quaker community including those on low incomes.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.