Dogfen lywodraethu LIVERPOOL SCHOOL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/01/1905 AS AMENDED 2/4/1951, 20/11/1992, 26/11/1993, 10/12/2004, 10/1/2007, 10/12/2010 NOW ARTICLES ACCEPTED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JAN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ENGAGE IN, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RESEARCH, STUDY AND INSTRUCTION IN CONNECTION WITH THE ORIGIN, CHARACTER, ALLEVIATION, PREVENTION AND CURE OF EVERY OR ANY TYPE OF TROPICAL DISEASE WHICH IS NOW OR MAY HEREAFTER BECOME KNOWN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHERE SUCH DISEASE EITHER MANIFESTS ITSELF OR HAS EFFECTS; AND TO 2) ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE LEARNING AND THE PRACTICE OF ALL SCIENCES AND ARTS ALLIED WITH OR WHICH MAY BE USEFULLY STUDIED IN CONNECTION WITH THE MATTERS AFORESAID, AND TO COLLECT AND CIRCULATE INFORMATION WITH REGARD TO SUCH DISEASES, SCIENCES AND ARTS.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.