Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY ACTION SHEFFIELD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORP 16 AUGUST 1926 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 31 MARCH 1950, 1 NOV 1976,13 JULY 1987, 11 SEPT 1990, 15 JUNE 1995, 21 OCT 1999, 16 NOV 2004 AND 23 NOV 2009 AND BY CERT.OF INCORP RE CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JULY 1989 as amended on 09 Dec 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.