Dogfen lywodraethu THE WILLIE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 11/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2015 as amended on 21 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
MAINTENANCE OF SIX ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED POOR OF THE PARISH OF GREAT TOTHAM. THREE OF SUCH ALMSHOUSES TO BE OCCUPIED BY WIDOWS AND THREE BY MARRIED COUPLES ALL OF WHOM HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH FOR 20 YEARS. SCHOOL ROOM FOR THE USE OF LECTURES AND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Maes buddion
GREAT TOTHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.