Dogfen lywodraethu CASUALTIES UNION
Rhif yr elusen: 234672
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 05/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/03/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN FIRST AID, THE TREATMENT OF ILLNESS, NURSING, RESCUE, ACCIDENT PREVENTION, CARE IN THE COMMUNITY AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY THROUGH CASUALTY SIMULATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.