Dogfen lywodraethu W R RAWLINGS TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH JUNE 1936 AND SCHEME OF 11TH NOVEMBER 1955 AND 27TH JANUARY 1983 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. OBJECTS THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME AND, AT THEIR DISCRETION ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL, OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 3.1 RELIEVING PERSONS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (A) WHO ARE MEMBERS OF OR CONNECTED WITH TRINITY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH, WIMBLEDON (“THE CHURCH”) OR (B) WHO RESIDE (WHETHER PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY) IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND ARE KNOWN TO PERSONS WHO ARE THEMSELVES MEMBERS OF OR CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH. 3.2 MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE CONGREGATIONAL PASTORS’ WIDOWS FUND OR THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH MINISTERS PENSION FUND FOR THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PERSONS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME BEEN MINISTERS OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH OR OF ANY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR WHO ARE THE SURVIVING SPOUSES OR SURVIVING DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH PERSONS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF EITHER OR BOTH SUCH FUNDS 3.3 MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE CHARITABLE FUNDS OF THE SYNOD OF THE SOUTHERN PROVINCE OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Maes buddion
WIMBLEDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.