Dogfen lywodraethu THE SOCIETY OF RETREAT CONDUCTORS

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/04/1927 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1998 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/04/2011 as amended on 26 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE AND ENABLE TRAINING FOR THE CONDUCTING OF RETREATS AND THE MINISTRY OF SPIRITUAL DIRECTION WITHIN THE TRADITION OF THE SPIRITUAL EXERCISES OF ST IGNATIUS LOYOLA; 2. TO CONDUCT RETREATS, PROVIDE SPIRITUAL DIRECTION AND OCCASIONAL CONFERENCES, AND TO ASSIST THOSE ENGAGED IN THESE MINISTRIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.