Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF LEWES VICTORIA HOSPITAL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7 MARCH 1966, AS AMENDED 29 MAY 1997, 27 MAY 1998, AND BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 JULY 2004. AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 21 OCT 2021 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 JUN 2022 as amended on 18 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO MOBILISE ENCOURAGE FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE LEWES VICTORIA HOSPITAL , AND LOCAL HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS THAT SUPPORT IT, BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE RULE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
THE HOSPITAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.